Global patent index - EP 1014388 A2

EP 1014388 A2 2000-06-28 - Bushing insulator

Title (en)

Bushing insulator

Title (de)

Durchführungsisolator

Title (fr)

Traversée-isolateur

Publication

EP 1014388 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99203928 A

Priority

IT MI982699 A

Abstract (en)

A bushing insulator for external use with high-level electrical strength characteristics particularly under high environmental contamination, comprising an insulating and supporting body which internally accommodates at least one conductor, a set of sheds being provided externally to the insulating and supporting body which is made of polymeric material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 17/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/26 (2013.01); H01B 17/265 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014388 A2 20000628; EP 1014388 A3 20001213; IT 1306242 B1 20010604; IT MI982699 A1 20000615

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040213

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB SERVICE SRL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010604

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI