Global Patent Index - EP 1014404 A1

EP 1014404 A1 2000-06-28 - Cassette drive with iluminatable pushbutton keys

Title (en)

Cassette drive with iluminatable pushbutton keys

Title (de)

Kassettenlaufwerk mit beleuchtbaren Laufwerkstasten

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement de cassette avec touches éclairables

Publication

EP 1014404 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123264 A

Priority

DE 19857864 A

Abstract (en)

The audio cassette player has illuminated tape transport operating buttons (10a,10b) used for operation of a switch rod (1a,1b). Each operating button incorporates a light source, e.g. a light-emitting diode, which is supplied with operating current via a flexible conductor (14), allowing mechanical separation of the operating buttons from the switch rod.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Kassettenlaufwerk, bei dem mit beleuchtbaren Laufwerkstasten ein Schaltgestänge betätigbar ist, ist vorgesehen, daß die Laufwerkstasten (10a, 10b) topfartig oder mit einer Ausnehmung mit jeweils einem durchleuchtbaren Boden ausgebildet sind, wobei in der Topföffnung oder in der Ausnehmung jeweils eine Lichtquelle angeordnet ist, die über flexible Leiter (14) mit Spannung versorgbar ist, daß die Laufwerkstasten (10a, 10b) mechanisch von dem Schaltgestänge entkoppelbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/02; H01H 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014404 A1 20000628; EP 1014404 B1 20030521; DE 19857864 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131129

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905637

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905637 P 20030626

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI