Global patent index - EP 1014405 A2

EP 1014405 A2 2000-06-28 - Push switch

Title (en)

Push switch

Title (de)

Druckschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à bouton poussoir

Publication

EP 1014405 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125555 A

Priority

JP 36263798 A

Abstract (en)

A push switch of the present invention, which suits for small switches used for various apparatuses, comprises (a) a switch substrate (110) having outer fixed contact units (130) and a central fixed contact unit (120), both of which are fixed to the substrate (110) and have contact portions exposed from upper side of the substrate (110), also have connecting terminals (121, 131) extended therefrom, (b) a movable contact unit (140) which is formed with an elastic thin metal plate, and has an outer portion (141) placed on the outer fixed contact units (130), also has a tongue shaped portion (142) which faces toward the central fixed contact unit (120) forming a predetermined insulation gap between the portion (142) and the fixed contact unit (120), (c) an elastic unit (150) which is formed with an elastic material, and has a conical portion (151) having an opening at the lower side thereof, an upward protrusion (153) and a downward protrusion (156) which protrudes downward from the upper end of the opening, and, presses the outer portion (141) with the lower end portion (152) of the conical portion (151), (d) an operation unit (160) which is disposed on the upward protrusion (153) of the elastic unit (150) in such a manner as to be movable up and down and has a protrusion (163) at the lower end periphery thereof for preventing the slip off of the operation unit (160), (e) a cover (171) which is fixed to the periphery of the switch substrate (110), and holds the operation unit (160) with the surrounding wall (172) thereof in such a manner as to be movable up and down without the upward slip off of the operation unit (160), also has a hole (171), through which the operation unit (160) protrudes, at the upper central portion thereof, wherein, when an upper end portion (164) of the operation unit (160) is pressed, the portion (151) elastically deforms first, whereby the protrusion (156) presses the portion (142), whereby the portion (142) touches the fixed contact unit (120), next at least one of the protrusion (153) or the protrusion (156) deforms, whereby the protrusion (163) touches the substrate (110). The above structure realizes a push switch in which component parts are handled without difficulty, and the assembling productivity is superior, also the operation stroke is long. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/52 (2006.01); H01H 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/20 (2013.01); H01H 2215/002 (2013.01); H01H 2215/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014405 A2 20000628; EP 1014405 A3 20011205; EP 1014405 B1 20070214; DE 69935119 D1 20070329; DE 69935119 T2 20070606; JP 2000188037 A 20000704; JP 3890789 B2 20070307

INPADOC legal status

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69935119

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69935119

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-03-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020304

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI