Global Patent Index - EP 1014415 A1

EP 1014415 A1 2000-06-28 - Circuit breaker

Title (en)

Circuit breaker

Title (de)

Schutzschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur

Publication

EP 1014415 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99124033 A

Priority

  • JP 36684898 A
  • JP 29797899 A

Abstract (en)

A circuit breaker rapidly breaking the short-circuit current prior to the operation of an overcurrent tripping device when a short-circuit current flows is obtained. An operation setting spring (63) is provided between engagement means B (53) of latch means holding a supporting member (32) of a toggle link (44, 46) linked to opening/closing contacts (8, 18) and engagement means A (52) held by a latch receiver (39) displaced by an operation of an overcurrent tripping device (64). When electromagnetic repulsion force generated by the short-circuit current strains the operation setting spring, engagement means B is disengaged and the toggle link supporting member instantaneously is displaced to rapidly break the short-circuit current. As engagement means B is displaced through this operation, latch receiver driving means (57) moves the latch receiver via a relay lever (55) to release the strain of the operation setting spring. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/43; H01H 77/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/12 (2006.01); H01H 71/24 (2006.01); H01H 73/36 (2006.01); H01H 77/10 (2006.01); H01H 71/50 (2006.01); H01H 73/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/2418 (2013.01); H01H 77/10 (2013.01); H01H 71/505 (2013.01); H01H 73/045 (2013.01); H01H 2071/507 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014415 A1 20000628; EP 1014415 B1 20020327; DE 69901091 D1 20020502; DE 69901091 T2 20021002; JP 2000243204 A 20000908; JP 3368238 B2 20030120

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-06-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69901091

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-02

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI