Global patent index - EP 1014467 A2

EP 1014467 A2 2000-06-28 - Frequency stabilised waveguide device

Title (en)

Frequency stabilised waveguide device

Title (de)

Frequenzstabilisierte Hohlleiteranordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à guide d'ondes stabilisé en fréquence

Publication

EP 1014467 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113768 A

Priority

DE 19859028 A

Abstract (en)

The waveguides (1, 2) have differing coefficients of thermal expansion. The transition section (3) between them, mechanically de-couples the differing thermal expansion coefficients.

Abstract (de)

Eine Hohlleiteranordnung weist einen ersten Hohlleiter (1) bestehend aus einem Material mit einem ersten thermischen Ausdehnungskoeffizienten und einem zweiten Hohlleiter (2) bestehend aus einem Material mit einem zweiten thermischen Ausdehnungskoeffizienten auf. Dazwischen befindet sich ein Übergangselement (3) zur mechanischen Entkopplung der unterschiedlichen thermischen Ausdehnungskoeffizienten der beiden Hohlleiter (1,2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/04; H01P 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/04 (2006.01); H01P 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/042 (2013.01); H01P 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014467 A2 20000628; EP 1014467 A3 20011024; DE 19859028 A1 20000629; US 2002089398 A1 20020711; US 6433656 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060201

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESAT-SPACECOM GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-09-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI