Global Patent Index - EP 1014468 A2

EP 1014468 A2 2000-06-28 - Flexible microwave switch matrix

Title (en)

Flexible microwave switch matrix

Title (de)

Flexible Mikrowellen-Schaltmatrix

Title (fr)

Matrice hyperfréquence de commutation flexible

Publication

EP 1014468 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125180 A

Priority

US 21768198 A

Abstract (en)

A planar microwave switch matrix including a plurality of inputs (22) for receiving input signals, a plurality of outputs (26) for transmitting output signals, and a plurality of nodes (20) connecting the inputs to the outputs. Each node (20) includes a switch (30), an input coupler (28) and an output coupler (32). The input and output couplers connecting input lines to output lines such that any input can be connected through a switch to any output. The planar microwave switch matrix is formed on a dual-sided circuit board to form a plurality of co-planar waveguide transmission lines. The layout of the microwave switch matrix allows any combination of input lines and output lines to be connected at a given time, while providing sufficient signal isolation to prevent interference. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 57/00 (2006.01); H01H 59/00 (2006.01); H01P 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014468 A2 20000628; EP 1014468 A3 20011107; CA 2292850 A1 20000621; JP 2000278001 A 20001006

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-08-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI