Global Patent Index - EP 1014472 A1

EP 1014472 A1 2000-06-28 - Directional coupler

Title (en)

Directional coupler

Title (de)

Richtkoppler

Title (fr)

Coupleur directionnel

Publication

EP 1014472 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123509 A

Priority

DE 19858470 A

Abstract (en)

The coupler includes loosely coupled sections (1,3) in microstrip line on one side of a printed circuit board and tightly coupled sections (2) between microstrip lines on opposite sides of the board with through connections (11).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Breitbandrichtkoppler mit mindestens zwei in Kaskade geschalteten Koppelabschnitten unterschiedlicher Koppeldämpfung bestehen die Koppelabschnitte mit loser Kopplung aus stirnseitig verkoppelten Streifenleitern und die Koppelabschnitte mit fester Kopplung aus breitseitig verkoppelten Streifenleitern; dabei sind die breitseitig verkoppelten Streifenleiter auf gegenüberliegenden Seiten eines Substrats und die stirnseitig verkoppelten Streifenleiter daran anschließend auf der Vorderseite des gleichen Substrats als Mikrostreifenleitungen ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/185 (2013.01); H01P 5/187 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • DE 1964412 A1 19700723 - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC
  • MEINKE/GUNDLACH: "Taschenbuch der Hochfrequenztechnik", 1992, 5. AUFLAGE, SPRINGER VERLAG
  • JONES, E.M.T. ET AL.: "Microwave filters, impedance-matching networks and coupling structures", ARTECH HOUSE BOOKS

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858470 A1 20000621; EP 1014472 A1 20000628; EP 1014472 B1 20040407

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151125

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909108

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI