Global Patent Index - EP 1014482 A2

EP 1014482 A2 2000-06-28 - Method for the control of the antenna of a mobile radio telephone network

Title (en)

Method for the control of the antenna of a mobile radio telephone network

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung der Antenne eines Mobiltelefonnetzwerkes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la commande de l'antenne d'un réseau de radiotéléphonie mobile

Publication

EP 1014482 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125386 A

Priority

IT MI982780 A

Abstract (en)

System for the control of single antennae or antenna arrays (1) of a mobile radio telephone network, which are installed on fixed bases (2) through a couple of supports (10, 11) rotating around a substantially horizontal axis and a substantially vertical axis, in which the form and dimensions of the coverage field (4) of each antenna (1) depend on the vertical pointing angle ( theta ) and on the horizontal pointing angle (). This system includes at least one central electronic processor connected through bi-directional lines (20) to a plurality of peripheral electronic processors (17) connected in their turn through bi-directional lines to one or more servomechanisms (13, 15) installed on said fixed bases (2), in which the mobile component of one of said servomechanisms (13, 15) is cinematically coupled to one of said supports (10, 11) of the antennas (1) and is operated by an actuator (e. g. a reduction gear) according to electrical signals transmitted by said central electronic processor through said peripheral processors (17), said electric signals corresponding to the variation of the vertical pointing angle ( theta ) and/or of the horizontal pointing angle () of the antennas (1) themselves. The present invention relates also to a control procedure implemented through said system. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/08; H01Q 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/08 (2013.01); H01Q 1/246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014482 A2 20000628; EP 1014482 A3 20020313; IT 1304083 B1 20010307; IT MI982780 A1 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS S.P.A.

2004-05-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE CONTROL OF THE ANTENNA OF A MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE NETWORK

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01Q 3/08 A, 7H 01Q 1/24 B, 7H 01Q 1/12 B, 7H 01Q 3/00 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI