Global Patent Index - EP 1014489 A2

EP 1014489 A2 2000-06-28 - Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (en)

Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (de)

Dielektrische Resonatorantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne résonateur diélectrique

Publication

EP 1014489 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99204261 A

Priority

DE 19858799 A

Abstract (en)

An electrically-conductive layer is provided in at least one curved surface (11) of the antenna. This is a surface into which the tangential field of a fundamental mode of the dielectric resonator antenna (9) vanishes. Independent claims are included for a mobile radio equipment, a receiver and a transmitter.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine dielektrische Resonatorantenne (9) sowie noch einen Sender, einen Empfänger und ein Mobilfunkgerät mit einer dielektrischen Resonatorantenne. Um bekannten Möglichkeiten zur Verkleinerung der DRA (9), die durch die Symmetrieebenen (10) in einer DRA gegeben sind, zu verbessern, wird vorgeschlagen, eine elektrisch leitende Schicht in wenigstens einer gekrümmten Fläche (11), in der die Tangentialkomponente eines elektrischen Feldes einer der dielektrischen Resonatorantenne (9) zugeordneten Eigenmode verschwindet, vorzusehen. Dadurch kann das Volumen der DRA (9) erheblich reduziert werden, obgleich sich weiterhin dieselbe Mode bei derselben Frequenz ausbildet. Da mehrere solcher gekrümmten Flächen (11) existieren, kann beispielsweise nach gewünschtem Miniaturisierungsgrad, erforderlicher Bandbreite der entstehenden Antenne und herstellungstechnischen Bedingungen eine besonders vorteilhafte Fläche (11) ausgewählt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04; H01Q 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/10 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/40 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/242 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0485 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858799 A1 20000621; CN 1126194 C 20031029; CN 1259777 A 20000712; EP 1014489 A2 20000628; EP 1014489 A3 20020116; EP 1014489 B1 20031112; JP 2000209019 A 20000728; KR 100710729 B1 20070424; KR 20000048184 A 20000725; TW 456070 B 20010921; US 6373441 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040106

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907706

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 9/04 A, 7H 01Q 1/24 B, 7H 01Q 13/24 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI