Global Patent Index - EP 1014491 A1

EP 1014491 A1 2000-06-28 - Wideband reflector antenna

Title (en)

Wideband reflector antenna

Title (de)

Breitbandreflektorantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne a reflecteur large bande

Publication

EP 1014491 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403201 A

Priority

FR 9816342 A

Abstract (en)

The reflector antenna has a reflector (21) with two surfaces forming a dihedral with a network of elementary sources (22). The elementary sources are inside the reflector surface space. The position of the phase center (24) of the elementary sources varies with frequency.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une antenne à réflecteur à large bande. L'antenne comporte un réflecteur (21) composé d'au moins deux surfaces formant un dièdre et un réseau de sources élémentaires (22) rayonnant des ondes hyperfréquence (49) vers les surfaces du réflecteur (21) pour former le faisceau d'antenne, le réseau de sources élémentaires (22) étant situé dans l'intérieur de l'espace formé par les surfaces du réflecteur (21), la position du centre de phase (24) des sources élémentaires variant avec la fréquence. L'invention s'applique notamment sur des systèmes émettant des ondes électromagnétiques sur une large bande, susceptibles par exemple d'être embarqués, et qui soient en outre de relativement faible coût. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 19/10; H01Q 3/46; H01Q 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/24 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 15/00 (2006.01); H01Q 15/12 (2006.01); H01Q 19/10 (2006.01); H01Q 19/17 (2006.01); H01Q 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/064 (2013.01); H01Q 3/245 (2013.01); H01Q 15/0013 (2013.01); H01Q 15/12 (2013.01); H01Q 19/10 (2013.01); H01Q 19/17 (2013.01); H01Q 19/175 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014491 A1 20000628; FR 2787928 A1 20000630

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI