Global patent index - EP 1014495 A1

EP 1014495 A1 2000-06-28 - Connecting spring

Title (en)

Connecting spring

Title (de)

Verbindungsfeder

Title (fr)

Ressort de connexion

Publication

EP 1014495 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420245 A

Priority

FR 9816585 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical spring connection (2) clamps the end of a stripped wire. There is a section (4) which is pushed into place against a separate static conductor wall. The stripped wire is held in position in a U-shaped section (8) made with the end wall. A guide section tab (20) allows easy clamping of the wire and insertion of the end tab section of the springy unit in an upper fixing hole (10).

Abstract (fr)

Ce ressort (2) permet de réaliser une connexion électrique d'un fil dénudé (18) dans une borne de raccordement. Il présente une branche d'appui (4) destinée à venir en appui contre une partie fixe conductrice (16) ainsi qu'une branche arrière (5), faisant face à la branche d'appui (4), reliée par une zone de liaison (8) élastique à cette dernière et dont l'extrémité libre est recourbée vers la branche d'appui (4) pour former une branche de pincement (6) mobile, présentant du côté de son extrémité libre, une partie sensiblement plane munie d'une ouverture (10) destinée au passage de la partie fixe conductrice (16) et du fil dénudé (18) de telle sorte que l'arête (12) de l'ouverture (10) située du côté de l'extrémité libre de la branche de pincement (6) mobile vienne maintenir l'extrémité dénudée du fil (18) en appui contre la partie fixe conductrice (16). Une zone de liaison (8) relie les deux branches (4,6) élastiquement. La branche d'appui (4) est munie d'une zone de guidage (20) s'étendant parallèlement à la branche de pincement (6), du côté opposé à la branche arrière (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4845 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014495 A1 20000628; EP 1014495 B1 20050209; BR 9905928 A 20000808; CA 2293179 A1 20000623; CA 2293179 C 20040720; DE 69923651 D1 20050317; DE 69923651 T2 20050630; ES 2237062 T3 20050716; FR 2787932 A1 20000630; FR 2787932 B1 20010309; US 6196883 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101216

2012-05-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120510

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101215

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101215

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101215

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2237062

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-05-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050425

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69923651

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ENTRELEC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI