Global Patent Index - EP 1014496 A2

EP 1014496 A2 2000-06-28 - Electrical connection device for high currents

Title (en)

Electrical connection device for high currents

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlussvorrichtung für hohe Ströme

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion électrique pour courants forts

Publication

EP 1014496 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124188 A

Priority

DE 19859196 A

Abstract (en)

The connection terminal (10) uses at least one wedge surface for pressing the heavy current conductor (12) against the electrical contact (14) e.g. provided by opposing clamp plates formed as part of the electrical conductor for clamping the electrical contact via an intermediate pressure plate (38). An Independent claim for a component group provided by a contact and a connection terminal is also included.

Abstract (de)

Eine Anschlußvorrichtung (10) zum lösbaren Verbinden eines darin angeordneten elektrischen Leiters (12) für hohe Ströme mit einem elektrischen Kontakt (14) ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß mindestens eine Keilfläche (44) vorgesehen ist, mittels der der elektrische Leiter (12) gegen den Kontakt (14) beaufschlagt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/50 (2006.01); H01R 13/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/5091 (2013.01); H01R 13/53 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014496 A2 20000628; EP 1014496 A3 20020508; DE 19859196 A1 20000713; US 6296532 B1 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI