Global patent index - EP 1014512 A2

EP 1014512 A2 2000-06-28 - Overvoltage protected socket

Title (en)

Overvoltage protected socket

Title (de)

Überspannungsgeschützte Steckdose

Title (fr)

Connecteur femelle protégé contre les surtensions

Publication

EP 1014512 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125691 A

Priority

DE 29823065 U

Abstract (en)

The socket has a switch-off contact connected to a sensor (10) arranged adjacent to the socket receptacle (6) in the socket case (1). An auxiliary plug (8), working with the sensor, is fitted in the socket receptacle and has an actuator which contactlessly influences the sensor when plugged in to switch off an audible sounder.

Abstract (de)

Eine solche Steckdose weist einen akustischen Signalgeber (11) auf, der bei Ausfall des Überspannungsschutzes ein akustisches Dauersignal abgibt. Die Steckdose hat ferner einen den Signalgeber (11) abschaltenden Ausschaltkontakt, der mit einem in die Steckdose einsteckbaren Stecker zusammenwirkt. Um im Störfall auch bei Nichtbelegung das akustische Dauersignal abschalten zu können und die Abschaltung erkenntlich zu machen, ist der Ausschaltkontakt mit einem Sensor (10) verbunden, der im Steckdosengehäuse (1) benachbart der Steckeraufnahme (6) angeordnet ist. Der mit dem Sensor zusammenwirkende Stecker ist ein in die Steckeraufnahme (6) passender Hilfsstecker (8) mit einem Aktor (9), der in eingesteckter Position des Hilfssteckers (8) den Sensor (10) unter Abschalten des Signalgebers (11) kontaktlos beeinflußt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6666 (2013.01); H01R 13/6691 (2013.01); H01R 13/7037 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29823065 U1 19990401; EP 1014512 A2 20000628; EP 1014512 A3 20010711; EP 1014512 B1 20030528

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905732

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905732

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/66 A, 7H 01R 13/703 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI