Global patent index - EP 1014528 A1

EP 1014528 A1 2000-06-28 - Electrical installation comprising transformer, off load tap changer and load breaker

Title (en)

Electrical installation comprising transformer, off load tap changer and load breaker

Title (de)

Elektroinstallation mit Wandler, Stufenschalter und Lastschalter

Title (fr)

Installation électrique comportant un transformateur, un commutateur de prises hors tension et un appareillage de coupure en charge

Publication

EP 1014528 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410164 A

Priority

FR 9815959 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical installation changeable winding setting has an electrical transformer (1) with primary (2) and secondary (3) windings, and load switch (15). The switch control has a moving rod chain (54) which does not transit to the switching unit (58) movement from a first winding to second winding position until the switch operation has passed from its intermediate to its second position.

Abstract (fr)

Une installation électrique de transformation comporte un transformateur 1, un commutateur de prises hors tension 26 et un appareillage de coupure en charge 15. Le commutateur de prises 26 est muni d'une sélecteur 30 permettant de mouvoir un organe de commutation 58 du commutateur. Des moyens de liaison 66 assure que, lorsque le sélecteur est actionné, l'appareillage de coupure 15 soit ouvert, de manière que le courant soit interrompu avant que l'organe de commutation 58 du commutateur de prise ne se meuve. On assure ainsi que la commutation a lieu hors courant. De préférence, le commutateur de prise 26 est branché entre l'appareillage de coupure 15 et les enroulements 2 du transformateur, de manière à assurer que la commutation a également lieu hors tension. Ces dispositions permettent d'éliminer les risques de fausse manoeuvre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02H 7/055; H01H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H02H 7/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02H 7/055 (2013.01); H01H 9/0005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2787248 A1 20000616; FR 2787248 B1 20010119; BR 9908659 A 20001017; BR 9908659 B1 20120918; CN 1220224 C 20050921; CN 1257294 A 20000621; DE 69940803 D1 20090610; EP 1014528 A1 20000628; EP 1014528 B1 20090429; ES 2323296 T3 20090710; NO 318793 B1 20050509; NO 996223 A 20000616; NO 996223 D0 19991215

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121119

2014-03-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140306

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69940803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130601

2012-03-01 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69940803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111228

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101119

2011-06-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091106

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2009-07-10 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2323296

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2009-06-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69940803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-06-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES SE

2009-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071213

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI