Global Patent Index - EP 1014563 A1

EP 1014563 A1 2000-06-28 - Amplifier arrangement with voltage gain and reduced power consumption

Title (en)

Amplifier arrangement with voltage gain and reduced power consumption

Title (de)

Verstärkungsanordnung mit Spannungsverstärkung und reduziertem Leistungsverbrauch

Title (fr)

Dispositif amplificateur à amplification de tension et consommation de puissance réduite

Publication

EP 1014563 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98403167 A

Priority

EP 98403167 A

Abstract (en)

An amplifier arrangement includes a first amplifier powered by a pair of lower voltage power supplies, a second amplifier powered by a pair of higher voltage power supplies and a drive control device. This amplifier arrangement has both current and voltage gain larger than one. The drive control device includes a regulating device adapted to switch off the first amplifier based on the output signal of the amplifier arrangement, and at least one current link and at least one voltage controlled current source. The transition between the operation of the first and second amplifiers is thereby controlled by the values of the currents of these at least one current links and the at least one voltage controlled current sources. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03F 1/02; H03F 3/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03F 3/68 (2006.01); H03F 1/02 (2006.01); H03F 1/32 (2006.01); H03F 3/00 (2006.01); H03F 3/10 (2006.01); H03F 3/21 (2006.01); H03F 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03F 3/211 (2013.01); H03F 1/0277 (2013.01); H03F 2200/516 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014563 A1 20000628; EP 1014563 B1 20060301; AU 6452199 A 20000615; CA 2286924 A1 20000614; DE 69833635 D1 20060427; DE 69833635 T2 20070118; IL 132438 D0 20010319; JP 2000183673 A 20000630; KR 20000052459 A 20000825; SG 74169 A1 20000718; TW 469692 B 20011221; US 6323729 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-08-22 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20140717

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69833635 P 20060427

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031211

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI