Global Patent Index - EP 1014607 A1

EP 1014607 A1 2000-06-28 - Method for reducing intensity distortions caused by cross-phase modulation in an optical WDM transmission system

Title (en)

Method for reducing intensity distortions caused by cross-phase modulation in an optical WDM transmission system

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reduzieren von Kreuzphasenmodulation-induzierter Intensitätsverzerrung in einem optischen WDM Übertragungssystem

Title (fr)

Procédé de réduction des distorsions d'intensité induités par la modulation de phase croisée dans un systeme de transmission à fibre optique à multiplexage de longueur d'onde

Publication

EP 1014607 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403120 A

Priority

FR 9816109 A

Abstract (en)

The cross phase modulation distortion reduction technique has an optical line (7) with several sections (TF) of fibre optics and a repeater (9). A time difference is introduced between consecutive repeater channels. the difference is chosen to be above zero and less than that which would lose the correlation between contributions.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de réduction de la distorsion d'intensité induite par la modulation de phase croisée dans un système (1) de transmission à fibre optique à multiplexage en longueur d'onde comprenant une ligne (7) de transmission formée de plusieurs tronçons (TF) de fibre optique avec un répéteur (9) interposé entre deux tronçons (TF) de fibre optique, le système de transmission (1) disposant de N canaux de longueurs d'onde différentes, N étant un nombre entier supérieur à l'unité. Au niveau de chaque répéteur (9) reliant un premier et un second tronçons consécutifs (TF) de fibre, on introduit un décalage temporel entre les canaux de telle sorte que par rapport à l'entrée du premier tronçon de fibre optique, le (n+1)-ième et le n-ième canal sont décalés de n à l'entrée du second tronçon (TF) de fibre, n étant un nombre entier inférieur ou égal à N, où n est choisi supérieur à zéro et inférieur à une valeur supprimant la corrélation des contributions de distorsion d'intensité de chaque tronçon (TF) de fibre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 10/18; H04J 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/10 (2006.01); H01S 3/06 (2006.01); H04B 10/2519 (2013.01); H04B 10/2525 (2013.01); H04B 10/2557 (2013.01); H04J 14/00 (2006.01); H04J 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/2519 (2013.01); H04B 10/2525 (2013.01); H04B 10/2557 (2013.01); H04J 14/02 (2013.01); H04B 2210/258 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] GB 2161612 A 19860115 - STC PLC
  • [X] EP 0657754 A1 19950614 - AT & T CORP [US]
  • [X] INOUE K: "SUPPRESSION TECHNIQUE FOR FIBER FOUR-WAVE MIXING USING OPTICAL MULTI-/DEMULTIPLEXERS AND A DELAY LINE", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, vol. 11, no. 3, 1 March 1993 (1993-03-01), pages 455 - 461, XP000577337, ISSN: 0733-8724

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014607 A1 20000628; EP 1014607 B1 20050713; AT 299628 T 20050715; CA 2292276 A1 20000621; DE 69926111 D1 20050818; DE 69926111 T2 20060420; FR 2787659 A1 20000623; FR 2787659 B1 20060721; JP 2000196525 A 20000714; JP 4172611 B2 20081029; US 6626591 B1 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-08-22 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20140717

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111213

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALCATEL

- Effective date: 20051231

2007-08-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-02-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-12-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051213

2005-11-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-10-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051024

2005-10-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-10-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-10-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69926111 P 20050818

2005-08-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050713

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031208

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI