Global patent index - EP 1014664 A2

EP 1014664 A2 2000-06-28 - Remote notification of receipt of a signal and its source

Title (en)

Remote notification of receipt of a signal and its source

Title (de)

Empfangsfernmeldung einer Signal und seiner Quelle

Title (fr)

Notification à distance de la réception d'un signal et sa source

Publication

EP 1014664 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310212 A

Priority

US 22007498 A

Abstract (en)

A method and apparatus for remote notification of a signal and its source are disclosed. The method involves receiving an information signal at a first device, determining a source of the information signal, establishing communications between the first device and a second device and transmitting from the first device to the second device, a signal identifying the source of the information signal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 3/537; H04M 3/533

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/57 (2006.01); H04M 1/658 (2006.01); H04M 3/53 (2006.01); H04M 3/537 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/573 (2013.01); H04M 1/658 (2013.01); H04M 3/5307 (2013.01); H04M 3/537 (2013.01); H04M 3/42042 (2013.01); H04M 3/42059 (2013.01); H04M 3/42229 (2013.01); H04M 3/54 (2013.01); H04M 2203/658 (2013.01); H04M 2242/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014664 A2 20000628; EP 1014664 A3 20021002; CA 2280474 A1 20000623

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI