Global Patent Index - EP 1014762 A1

EP 1014762 A1 2000-06-28 - Charged particle beamline with switchable photon properties using two insertion devices, parallel beam displacement and single focusing optics

Title (en)

Charged particle beamline with switchable photon properties using two insertion devices, parallel beam displacement and single focusing optics

Title (de)

Beladenteilchenstrahlenzuführung mit shaltbaren Photoneigenschaften durch zwei Einfugüngsvorrichtungen, Parallelstrahlbewegung und Punkt-Fokus-Optik

Title (fr)

Installation de guidage de faisceaux de particules chargées avec caractéristiques de commutation des photons par utilisation de deux dispositifs d'insertion, déplacement parallèle des faisceaux et optique à foyer unique

Publication

EP 1014762 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98124367 A

Priority

EP 98124367 A

Abstract (en)

An arrangement for producing parallelly displaced beams of photons of different properties from a single beam of charged particles comprises at least means (ID1, ID2) for producing beams (1', 2') of photons of different properties with small divergence () from and parallel to the single charged particle beam. In addition, the arrangement comprises means (3, 5, 7) for parallel displacement of the single charged beam into or within the means for producing the photon beams and focusing means (11) for focusing the photon beams onto the same image plane. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] MARTYNOV V V ET AL: "Elliptically polarizing undulator beamline 4.0.1 for magnetic spectroscopy at the Advanced Light Source", OPTICS FOR HIGH-BRIGHTNESS SYNCHROTRON RADIATION BEAMLINES II, DENVER, CO, USA, 6-7 AUG. 1996, vol. 2856, ISSN 0277-786X, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1996, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, pages 289 - 299, XP002104582
  • [DA] HARA T ET AL: "SPring-8 twin helical undulator", SRI '97. 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYNCHROTRON RADIATION INSTRUMENTATION, HIMEJI, JAPAN, 4-8 AUG. 1997, vol. 5, pt.3, ISSN 0909-0495, Journal of Synchrotron Radiation, 1 May 1998, Munksgaard International Booksellers and Publishers for Int. Union Crystallogr, Denmark, pages 426 - 427, XP002104583
  • [A] CORNACCHIA M: "Advanced light source at Lawrence Berkeley Laboratory", 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYNCHROTRON RADIATION INSTRUMENTATION, TSUKUBA, JAPAN, 29 AUG.-2 SEPT. 1988, vol. 60, no. 7, pt.2A, ISSN 0034-6748, Review of Scientific Instruments, July 1989, USA, pages 1388 - 1392, XP002104584

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014762 A1 20000628

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030116

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI