Global Patent Index - EP 1014813 A1

EP 1014813 A1 2000-07-05 - THIN CIGARETTES

Title (en)

THIN CIGARETTES

Title (de)

DÜNNE ZIGARETTE

Title (fr)

CIGARETTES FINES

Publication

EP 1014813 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955453 A

Priority

  • DE 19746664 A
  • EP 9806524 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19746664A1] The invention relates to a filter cigarette with a strand of tobacco enclosed in cigarette paper. Said strand has a diameter ranging from 5 - 7 mm and a smoke yield with a maximum of 1 mg condensate. The cigarette comprises a filter element which is situated on the tobacco side of the cigarette and has a relative retention greater than 90 %, and a filtering element which is located on the mouth side of the cigarette and has a relative retention less than 10 %. The cigarette also comprises a ventilation zone which runs in a circumferential direction in the wrapping and covering paper, said ventilation zone being situated at a distance from the filter end located on the mouth side of the cigarette. The length of said filter end is at least 1 mm shorter than that of the stopper located on the mouth side of the cigarette. The strand yield ratio nicotine/condensate multiplied by 10 is greater than or equal to 1, 0. The entire length of the filter is between 25 - 30 mm and has a diameter between 5 - 7 mm. The length of the filter stopper on the mouth side of the cigarette is between 13 - 18 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24D 1/00; A24D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 1/00 (2006.01); A24D 1/04 (2006.01); A24D 3/00 (2006.01); A24D 3/04 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A24D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 1/00 (2013.01); A24D 3/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921445A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19746664 A1 19990506; AT 230222 T 20030115; AU 1228399 A 19990517; BG 104469 A 20010131; BG 64071 B1 20031231; CN 1130134 C 20031210; CN 1286597 A 20010307; CZ 20001236 A3 20010214; CZ 296334 B6 20060215; DK 1014813 T3 20030422; EA 001553 B1 20010423; EE 200000175 A 20010615; EP 1014813 A1 20000705; EP 1014813 B1 20030102; ES 2189266 T3 20030701; GE P20022668 B 20011210; HK 1035305 A1 20041119; HR P20000237 A2 20010228; HR P20000237 B1 20121031; HU 0004925 A2 20010528; HU 0004925 A3 20011029; HU 225286 B1 20060928; ID 26565 A 20010118; JP 2001520874 A 20011106; OA 11403 A 20040412; PL 187543 B1 20040730; PL 340072 A1 20010115; SI 1014813 T1 20030430; SK 283635 B6 20031104; SK 5572000 A3 20000912; TR 200001103 T2 20001221; US 6502582 B1 20030107; WO 9921445 A1 19990506; YU 23400 A 20011226; YU 49400 B 20051128

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20090605

2009-03-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20080812

2008-12-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20080812

2008-12-24 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20080812

2008-12-16 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20081205

2008-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071004

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071009

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071010

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071015

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071012

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071003

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2005-08-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH; DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SP73

- Effective date: 20050715

2005-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-06-30 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Ref Legal Event Code: TE4A

- Free Format Text: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH DE

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2004-06-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2004-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.

2003-12-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189266

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030401160

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-04-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806829

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030104

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: 20030102:NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000411;LT PAYMENT 20000411;LV PAYMENT 20000411;MK PAYMENT 20000411;RO PAYMENT 20000411;SI PAYMENT 20000411

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 230222

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000411;LT PAYMENT 20000411;LV PAYMENT 20000411;MK PAYMENT 20000411;RO PAYMENT 20000411;SI PAYMENT 20000411