Global Patent Index - EP 1014825 A1

EP 1014825 A1 2000-07-05 - WATERPROOF CASE IN PARTICULAR TO SEA WATER OPENING BY MERE PRESSURE ON TWO OPPOSITE POINTS

Title (en)

WATERPROOF CASE IN PARTICULAR TO SEA WATER OPENING BY MERE PRESSURE ON TWO OPPOSITE POINTS

Title (de)

EIN INSBESONDERE FÜR MEERESWASSER DICHTES ETUI, DAS SICH DURCH DRUCK AUF ZWEI GEGENÜBERLIEGENDE SEITEN ÖFFNET

Title (fr)

ETUI ETANCHE EN PARTICULIER A L'EAU DE MER S'OUVRANT PAR SIMPLE PRESSION SUR DEUX POINTS OPPOSES

Publication

EP 1014825 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98913816 A

Priority

  • FR 9800414 W
  • FR 9702891 A
  • FR 9801799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9838887A1] The invention concerns a waterproof case, in particular to sea water, opening by mere pressure on two opposite points, consisting of a flattened wallet (1) preferably made in one single piece of synthetic material and comprising on the inner face of the opening edges (5, 6) at least a compressible bonded or sealed joint (7) pressed against the second joint (8) or the opposite edge so as to make it absolutely waterproof when no pressure is exerted, the walls of the device being arranged such that pressure on the side ends of these edges causes them to move apart thus providing access inside the device. The invention is useful for the protection of various objects such as coins, bank notes, keys, identity papers against water, perspiration, sand, dust and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 11/22; A45C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 1/02 (2006.01); A45C 11/22 (2006.01); A45C 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 1/02 (2013.01); A45C 11/22 (2013.01); A45C 13/10 (2013.01); A45C 1/04 (2013.01); Y10S 150/90 (2013.01); Y10S 206/811 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9838887A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9838887 A1 19980911; AU 6837998 A 19980922; DE 69816631 D1 20030828; DE 69816631 T2 20040415; EP 1014825 A1 20000705; EP 1014825 B1 20030723; ES 2202828 T3 20040401; FR 2760950 A1 19980925; FR 2760950 B1 19990820; PT 1014825 E 20031231; US 2001026650 A1 20011004; US 6361210 B2 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120304

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120303

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69816631

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120303

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120303

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101004

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DENKO, JACQUES

- Free text: DENKO, JACQUES#RESIDENCE LES CIGALONS, 19, AVENUE DES COCCINELLES#F-13012 MARSEILLE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- DENKO, JACQUES#RESIDENCE LES CIGALONS, 19, AVENUE DES COCCINELLES#F-13012 MARSEILLE (FR)

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090903

2009-09-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090903

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090310

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-30 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Free text: RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20070305

2006-10-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060904

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202828 T3

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404324

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816631 P 20030828

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990826

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT