Global Patent Index - EP 1014834 A2

EP 1014834 A2 2000-07-05 - DRIVE MECHANISM FOR ADJUSTING PARTS IN FURNITURE FOR SITTING AND LYING DOWN

Title (en)

DRIVE MECHANISM FOR ADJUSTING PARTS IN FURNITURE FOR SITTING AND LYING DOWN

Title (de)

ANTRIEB ZUM VERSTELLEN VON TEILEN BEI SITZ- UND LIEGEMÖBELN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR LE REGLAGE DE PARTIES DE MEUBLES FAITS POUR S'ASSEOIR OU POUR S'ALLONGER

Publication

EP 1014834 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98931904 A

Priority

  • DE 9801040 W
  • DE 19718255 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19718255C1] The basic housing (2) contains two electrically driven actuators (3) for each rotating a shaft (5) with control lever (4). Each actuator has a spindle (7) engaging with a gear (6) at one top end, and a longitudinally moving (A) adjusting element (8) with a contact surface (9,10) resting on the control lever, and screwed onto the spindle. The actuators have a longitudinal side (11) pointing towards the shafts, and a longitudinal side (12) pointing away from the shafts. The longitudinal side facing the shaft faces the longitudinal side of the other actuator facing away from the shafts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/031 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01); A47C 20/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/041 (2013.01); A47C 20/08 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18576 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848667A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19718255 C1 19980924; DK 1014834 T3 20020128; EP 1014834 A2 20000705; EP 1014834 B1 20011004; ES 2165174 T3 20020301; JP 2001522277 A 20011113; JP 3420773 B2 20030630; US 6269707 B1 20010807; WO 9848667 A2 19981105; WO 9848667 A3 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: DEWERTOKIN GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20130625

2013-07-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DEWERTOKIN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DEWERT ANTRIEBS- UND SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH, 32278 KIRCHLENGERN, DE

- Document: DE 59801659

- Effective date: 20130529

2013-07-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801659

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE LIPPERT, STACHOW & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130529

2013-07-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801659

- Representative's name: LIPPERT STACHOW PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE , DE

- Effective date: 20130529

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110410

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-05-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120524

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110409

2012-02-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-12-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111124 AND 20111129

2011-11-09 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-09-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-06-29 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110614

2011-06-29 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110614

2011-05-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DEWERTOKIN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OKIN MOTION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, 51645 GUMMERSBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59801659

- Effective date: 20110314

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-09-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165174 T3

2002-01-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011218

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801659 20011108

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL