Global Patent Index - EP 1014840 A1

EP 1014840 A1 2000-07-05 - NOVELTY ARTICLE

Title (en)

NOVELTY ARTICLE

Title (de)

NEUHEITSARTIKEL

Title (fr)

ARTICLE FANTAISIE

Publication

EP 1014840 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919927 A

Priority

  • US 9808469 W
  • US 4455297 P
  • US 5030698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848677A1] A novelty article (10) for use in connection with liquid has a body (12) and a generating mechanism (34), which is attached to the body (12), for generating electrically produced special effects, such as audible sounds and visible lights, so as to enhance amusement for a user. The generating mechanism (34) is provided with an activating mechanism (40), which is attached to the body (12), for activating the generating mechanism (34) in response to contact by liquid. In accordance with one feature of the present invention, the body (12) includes a drinking straw having a passageway (14) for liquid. The activating mechanism (40) has a pair of electrical contacts (46, 48) positioned in the passageway (14) so as to activate the generating mechanism (34) in response to liquid flow through the passageway (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 21/08; G01F 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 23/24 (2006.01); A47G 19/22 (2006.01); A47G 21/02 (2006.01); A47G 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/182 (2013.01); A47G 21/02 (2013.01); A47G 2200/08 (2013.01); A47G 2200/143 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848677 A1 19981105; CA 2286550 A1 19981105; EP 1014840 A1 20000705; EP 1014840 A4 20001018; JP 2002516633 A 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020830

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOY WORLD, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JOY WORLD, INC.

2000-10-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT