Global patent index - EP 1014909 A1

EP 1014909 A1 2000-07-05 - DISPOSABLE TRAINING PANT WITH ELASTICIZED SIDE PANELS

Title (en)

DISPOSABLE TRAINING PANT WITH ELASTICIZED SIDE PANELS

Title (de)

WEGWERFERZIEHUNGSHÖSCHEN MIT ELASTIFIZIERTEN SEITENTEILEN

Title (fr)

CULOTTE DE PROPRETE JETABLE A FLANCS ELASTIQUES

Publication

EP 1014909 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946955 A

Priority

  • US 9818975 W
  • US 93138997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9913813A1] A disposable absorbent article (10) which can be configured as a panty type garment, a disposable diaper, or an adult incontinent product, includes a back sheet (26), an absorbent panel (28) positioned on top of the back sheet (26), and a liquid permeable top sheet (30) positioned on top of the absorbent panel (28). A pair of longitudinally extending, elasticized unitary leg gather assemblies (32) are positioned on respective opposite sides of a longitudinal centerline (CL) of the article. Waist elastic elements (104, 105) extend partly or substantially totally across a waist encircling portion (12, 14) of the garment. Opposing side regions (19a-19d) of the garment each include a plurality of side elastic elements (106) which extend laterally, and are arranged spaced apart longitudinally between leg encircling regions (18), and the waist elastic elements (104). Each leg gather assembly (32) includes an outer sleeve (32') having an upstanding portion (34) within which are positioned elastically contractible elastic elements (38, 38') which effect conformance of the leg gather assemblies (32) with a wearer for desired containment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/496 (2013.01); A61F 13/49014 (2013.01); A61F 13/49413 (2013.01); A61F 13/4942 (2013.01); A61F 2013/49025 (2013.01); A61F 2013/49049 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9913813 A1 19990325; CA 2303941 A1 19990325; CA 2303941 C 20060117; EP 1014909 A1 20000705; EP 1014909 A4 20050330

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080118

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070907

2005-03-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20050211

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PARGASS, SUNITA

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE