Global Patent Index - EP 1014994 A1

EP 1014994 A1 2000-07-05 - PHOSPHONO-CARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING AMYLOIDOSIS

Title (en)

PHOSPHONO-CARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING AMYLOIDOSIS

Title (de)

PHOSPHONOCARBOXYLATVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AMYLOIDOSYS

Title (fr)

COMPOSES DE PHOSPHONO-CARBOXYLATE CONCUS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'AMYLOSE

Publication

EP 1014994 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98966963 A

Priority

  • IB 9800967 W
  • US 91257497 A
  • US 7444598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908685A1] Therapeutic compounds and methods for modulating amyloid deposition in a subject, whatever its clinical setting, are described. Amyloid deposition is modulated by the administration to a subject of an effective amount of a therapeutic compound comprising a phosphonate group and a carboxylate group, a congener thereof, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt or ester thereof. In preferred embodiments, an interaction between an amyloidogenic protein and a basement membrane constituent is modulated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/66; A61K 31/67; C07F 9/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/66 (2006.01); A61K 31/675 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07F 9/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/662 (2013.01); A61K 31/675 (2013.01); C07F 9/4065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908685A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908685 A1 19990225; CA 2300910 A1 19990225; CA 2300910 C 20080226; EP 1014994 A1 20000705; IL 134619 D0 20010430; JP 2001515039 A 20010918; NZ 550116 A 20080328

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030541

2008-08-20 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080609

2007-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEUROCHEM (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020723

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE