Global Patent Index - EP 1015006 A2

EP 1015006 A2 2000-07-05 - COCOA EXTRACT COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME

Title (en)

COCOA EXTRACT COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME

Title (de)

KAKAO-EXTRAKT VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSES D'EXTRAITS DE CACAO ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1015006 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97929671 A

Priority

  • US 9705693 W
  • US 9604497 W
  • US 63166196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736497A2] Disclosed and claimed are cocoa extracts, compounds, combinations thereof and compositions containing the same, such as polyphenols or procyanidins, methods for preparing such extracts, compounds and compositions, as well as uses for them, especially a polymeric compound of the formula An, wherein A is a monomer of formula (I) wherein n is an integer from 2 to 18, such that there is at least one terminal monomeric unit A, and one or a plurality of additional monomeric units; R is 3-( alpha )-OH, 3-( beta )-OH, 3-( alpha )-O-sugar ou 3-( beta )-O-sugar; bonding between adjacent monomers takes place at positions 4, 6 or 8; a bond of an additional monomeric unit in position 4 has alpha or beta stereochemistry; X, Y and Z are selected from the group consisting of monomeric unit A, hydrogen, and a sugar, with the provisos that as to the at least one terminal monomeric unit, bonding of the additional monomeric unit thereto (the bonding of the additional monomeric unit adjacent to the terminal monomeric unit) is at position 4 and optionally Y = Z = hydrogen; the sugar is optionally substituted with a phenolic moiety, at any position on the sugar, for instance via an ester bond; and pharmaceutically acceptable salts or derivatives thereof (including oxidation products).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 35/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23G 1/30 (2006.01); A23G 1/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/28 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/365 (2006.01); A61K 31/366 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7012 (2006.01); A61K 31/7042 (2006.01); A61K 31/7048 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/02 (2006.01); A61P 3/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 3/08 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 39/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 311/62 (2006.01); C07H 17/06 (2006.01); C07H 17/065 (2006.01); C12Q 1/00 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2013.01); C07D 311/62 (2013.01); C07H 17/06 (2013.01); C12Q 1/00 (2013.01); C12Q 1/02 (2013.01); G01N 33/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736497 A2 19971009; WO 9736497 A3 19971224; AU 3367497 A 19971022; AU 742198 B2 20011220; BR 9710955 A 20010313; CA 2250792 A1 19971009; CA 2250792 C 20110913; CN 1159019 C 20040728; CN 1221344 A 19990630; EP 1015006 A2 20000705; EP 1015006 A4 20030924; EP 2110134 A1 20091021; HK 1020881 A1 20050311; JP 2000506901 A 20000606; JP 2011006427 A 20110113; PL 329325 A1 19990329; RU 2010111103 A 20110927

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20081128

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-09-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 35/78 A

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/353 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/704 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 9/00 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 29/00 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 31/04 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/00 B

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 35/78 A, 7A 61K 31/35 B, 7A 61K 31/705 B, 7A 61P 9/00 B, 7A 61P 29/00 B, 7A 61P 31/04 B, 7A 61P 35/00 B

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 35/78 A, 7A 61K 31/35 B, 7A 61K 31/705 B

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981028

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE