Global Patent Index - EP 1015021 A2

EP 1015021 A2 2000-07-05 - AGENTS FOR COMBATING BACTERIAL MENINGITIS

Title (en)

AGENTS FOR COMBATING BACTERIAL MENINGITIS

Title (de)

MITTEL GEGEN BAKTERIELLE MENINGITIS

Title (fr)

AGENTS POUR LUTTER CONTRE LA MENINGITE PURULENTE

Publication

EP 1015021 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98952634 A

Priority

  • DE 19741955 A
  • EP 9806069 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19741955A1] The invention relates to novel agents for combating bacterial meningitis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/48; A61K 38/55; A61K 39/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/46 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 39/095 (2006.01); A61K 39/102 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/092 (2013.01); A61K 38/1774 (2013.01); A61K 38/482 (2013.01); A61K 38/4886 (2013.01); A61K 39/095 (2013.01); A61K 39/102 (2013.01); C07K 16/40 (2013.01); C12Y 304/21072 (2013.01); C12Y 304/24013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915198A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19741955 A1 19990401; CA 2304615 A1 19990401; EP 1015021 A2 20000705; JP 2001517637 A 20011009; WO 9915198 A2 19990401; WO 9915198 A3 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER WISSENS

2002-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/48 A, 7A 61K 38/55 B, 7A 61K 39/395 B, 7A 61P 31/04 B

2001-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/48 A, 7A 61K 38/55 B, 7A 61K 39/395 B, 7A 61P 31/04 B

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE