Global Patent Index - EP 1015036 A1

EP 1015036 A1 2000-07-05 - DELAYED EXPRESSION OF IMMUNOGENIC PEPTIDES IN CELLULAR THERAPY OF TUMOURS

Title (en)

DELAYED EXPRESSION OF IMMUNOGENIC PEPTIDES IN CELLULAR THERAPY OF TUMOURS

Title (de)

VERZÖGERUNG DER EXPRESSION DER IMMUNOGENEN PEPTIDEDEN IN ZELLTHERAPIE GEGEN TUMOREN

Title (fr)

RETARDEMENT DE L'EXPRESSION DE PEPTIDES IMMUNOGENES EN THERAPIE CELLULAIRE CONTRE LES TUMEURS

Publication

EP 1015036 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98941611 A

Priority

  • GB 9802693 W
  • GB 9718872 A
  • GB 9723448 A
  • US 7644898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912574A1] Disclosed is a method of regulating the expression in a human or animal subject of a nucleic acid sequence encoding a polypeptide which is immunogenic in the subject; the method comprising introducing into the subject a cell comprising the nucleic acid sequence encoding the immunogenic polypeptide, said sequence being operably linked to a drug-regulatable promoter; and altering the concentration of regulatory drug to which the cell is exposed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; C12N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/26 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/0783 (2010.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/0636 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2510/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912574A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912574 A1 19990318; AT 237360 T 20030515; AU 734877 B2 20010621; AU 747045 B2 20020509; AU 8879998 A 19990329; AU 8992698 A 19990329; CA 2303617 A1 19990318; CA 2303618 A1 19990318; DE 69813573 D1 20030522; DE 69813573 T2 20040226; EP 1009442 A1 20000621; EP 1009442 B1 20030416; EP 1015036 A1 20000705; JP 2001515709 A 20010925; JP 2001515873 A 20010925; WO 9912573 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 A

2003-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/10 B

2003-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2003-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/00 B

2003-09-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DELAYED EXPRESSION OF IMMUNOGENIC PEPTIDES IN CELLULAR THERAPY OF TUMOURS

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOFOCUS DISCOVERY LIMITED

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAMBRIDGE GENETICS LIMITED

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE