Global Patent Index - EP 1015046 A2

EP 1015046 A2 2000-07-05 - MICRODISPERSE DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS

Title (en)

MICRODISPERSE DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS

Title (de)

MIKRODISPERSIONS-VERABREICHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ARZNEIMITTEL

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES D'APPORT DE MEDICAMENTS PAR MICRODISPERSION

Publication

EP 1015046 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99933952 A

Priority

  • US 9915781 W
  • US 9276798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003753A2] Methods and compositions relating to microdispersion formulations for enhanced bioavailability of therapeutic agents are disclosed. Microdispersions of the compositions of the invention are formed upon contact with aqueous fluids, including physiologic fluids.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 9/14 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/22 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/1075 (2013.01); A61K 9/1617 (2013.01); A61K 9/4858 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003753A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003753 A2 20000127; WO 0003753 A3 20000504; AU 4989299 A 20000207; CA 2302735 A1 20000127; CN 1273526 A 20001115; DE 1015046 T1 20010208; EP 1015046 A2 20000705; JP 2002520377 A 20020709; ZA 200001010 B 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2001-02-08 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2000-08-18 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 9/14 A

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE