Global Patent Index - EP 1015075 A2

EP 1015075 A2 2000-07-05 - STIMULATION OF NON CONVENTIONAL BODY-ENDOGENOUS LIGHT FOR IT TO INTERFERE, INCLUDING FOR MEDICAL/THERAPEUTIC PURPOSES

Title (en)

STIMULATION OF NON CONVENTIONAL BODY-ENDOGENOUS LIGHT FOR IT TO INTERFERE, INCLUDING FOR MEDICAL/THERAPEUTIC PURPOSES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ANREGUNG VON INTERFERENZEN VON NICHTKLASSISCHEM, KÖRPEREIGENEM LICHT, INSBESONDERE FÜR MEDIZINISCHE-THERAPEUTISCHE ZWECKE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'EXCITATION DE LA LUMIERE NON CONVENTIONELLE ENDOGENE A L'ORGANISME POUR LA FAIRE AGIR, NOTAMMENT A DES FINS MEDICALES/THERAPEUTIQUES

Publication

EP 1015075 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98925481 A

Priority

  • DE 29707534 U
  • DE 29707535 U
  • DE 29710754 U
  • EP 9802431 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848886A2] Biophotons are so far the smallest electromagnetically interactive entities (quanta). Scientific research in this relatively recent field of biophysics has established with certainty that each living cell gives light and that light circulates inside the body and operates as a vector for transmitting information between living cells. The aim of the invention is to harness the non conventional light properties, especially for medical/therapeutic purposes, by creating an endogenous light circuit and causing such light to interfere, after which it is returned to the body. In order to reach that objective, the invention suggests that a system of the type mentioned above should comprise at least two contact elements (1; 15a, 15b; 21, 23), photoconductive transmission elements (2; 14; 24) being connected to said contact elements, and that one interference element (3; 16; 25) be inserted between the photoconductive transmitting elements and connected thereto.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61N 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 5/0618 (2013.01); A61N 2005/0636 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848886A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848886 A2 19981105; WO 9848886 A3 19990610; DE 19880545 D2 19991028; EP 1015075 A2 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051106

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-01-02 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000202

2001-12-05 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2001-11-14 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE