Global Patent Index - EP 1015117 A1

EP 1015117 A1 2000-07-05 - MICROEDDY MILL AND METHOD FOR DRYING AND DEAGGLOMERATING POWDERY MATERIALS

Title (en)

MICROEDDY MILL AND METHOD FOR DRYING AND DEAGGLOMERATING POWDERY MATERIALS

Title (de)

MIKROWIRBELMÜHLE UND VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKNEN UND DESAGGLOMERIEREN VON PULVERFÖRMIGEN MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

MOULIN A MICROTOURBILLON ET PROCEDE POUR LE SECHAGE ET LA DESAGGLOMERATION DE MATERIAUX EN POUDRE

Publication

EP 1015117 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98921494 A

Priority

  • DE 19719840 A
  • EP 9802512 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719840A1] Disclosed is a microeddy mill (1) for drying and deagglomerating powdery material which is preferably fed in the form of a slurry, wherein the material is introduced into the microeddy mill (1) by means of a jet suction device (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/18; B02C 13/286; B02C 23/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/18 (2006.01); B02C 13/286 (2006.01); B02C 23/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/18 (2013.01); B02C 13/286 (2013.01); B02C 23/28 (2013.01); B02C 2013/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851413A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719840 A1 19981119; EP 1015117 A1 20000705; EP 1015117 B1 20030212; WO 9851413 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080407

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807202 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-10-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATRITOR LIMITED

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUFSCHMIDT, ROLF, DIPL.-ING.

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RINGE, PETER, DR.

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERG, HANS-JUERGEN, DIPL.-ING.

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT