Global Patent Index - EP 1015145 A1

EP 1015145 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING HELICALLY WOUND LOCK-SEAM TUBING

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING HELICALLY WOUND LOCK-SEAM TUBING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GEFALZTEN SCHRAUBENNAHTROHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'UN TUBE A SERTISSAGE ENROULE DE MANIERE HELICOIDALE

Publication

EP 1015145 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 96906144 A

Priority

  • SE 9600292 W
  • SE 9501750 A
  • US 40075295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9627455A1] In a method for producing helically wound lock-seam tubing (33), a metal strip is fed to a forming head in which the tubing is formed. In order to prevent lock-seam slip, a clinching roller device (30-40) forms interlocking spaced deformations (41) on the lock-seam (37). An apparatus for such production comprises a clinching roller (30) provided with a recess (40) for forming the deformations (41) against a counter-roller (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 37/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/12 (2006.01); B21D 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/121 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9627455A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9627455 A1 19960912; AT 229850 T 20030115; AU 4961296 A 19960923; CA 2214493 A1 19960912; CA 2214493 C 20060502; CN 1077463 C 20020109; CN 1177935 A 19980401; CZ 293154 B6 20040218; CZ 9702826 A3 19990414; DE 69625525 D1 20030130; DE 69625525 T2 20030904; DK 1015145 T3 20030407; EP 1015145 A1 20000705; EP 1015145 B1 20021218; EP 1266704 A1 20021218; ES 2187636 T3 20030616; HU 223347 B1 20040628; HU 9801707 A2 19981130; HU 9801707 A3 20000628; JP H11501256 A 19990202; NO 312017 B1 20020304; NO 974074 A 19971027; NO 974074 D0 19970904; PL 179477 B1 20000929; PL 322144 A1 19980105

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69625525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130307

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-10-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2013-10-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SPIRO SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120307

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-01-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 229850

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120306

2012-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120906

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120306

2012-10-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-09-14 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120906

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120404

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SPIRO S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2012-05-30 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20120529

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2011-09-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: SPIRO SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110824

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SPIRO S.A., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69625525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69625525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-08-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110728 AND 20110803

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110302

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110316

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2187636

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69625525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-30

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69625525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 229850

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970905

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE