Global Patent Index - EP 1015184 A4

EP 1015184 A4 2000-08-09 - GRANULAR PARTICLE GRIPPING SURFACE

Title (en)

GRANULAR PARTICLE GRIPPING SURFACE

Title (de)

GREIFOBERFLÄCHE MIT KÖRNIGEN TEILCHEN

Title (fr)

SURFACE DE PREHENSION A PARTICULES GRANULEUSES

Publication

EP 1015184 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97941657 A

Priority

  • US 9716443 W
  • US 71344496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9810899A1] This invention provides an improved apparatus for gripping oil field tubular members (10). The apparatus has a gripping surface (53) which comprises a backing surface (5) adapted to contact an oil field tubular member (10) where the backing surface (5) is attachable to the apparatus for gripping oil field tubular members (10). The apparatus further has a granulated particle coating (7) formed on this baking surface (5). In a preferred embodiment, the gripping surface (4) will include a refractory metal carbide selected from the group consisting of the carbides of silicon, tungsten, molybdenum, chromium, tantalum, niobium, vanadium, titanium, zirconium, and boron.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 19/16; B25B 1/24; B25B 13/50; E21B 23/01; E21B 33/129

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 1/24 (2006.01); B25B 13/50 (2006.01); E21B 19/16 (2006.01); E21B 23/01 (2006.01); E21B 33/129 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/164 (2013.01); B25B 1/241 (2013.01); B25B 13/5016 (2013.01); B25B 13/5083 (2013.01); E21B 23/01 (2013.01); E21B 33/1293 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810899 A1 19980319; CA 2266367 A1 19980319; CA 2266367 C 20081104; DE 69726196 D1 20031218; EP 1015184 A1 20000705; EP 1015184 A4 20000809; EP 1015184 B1 20031112

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-08-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-02-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040213

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69726196

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020409

2000-08-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 21B 19/16 A, 7B 25B 13/50 B, 7E 21B 33/129 B, 7E 21B 23/01 B, 7B 25B 1/24 B

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990412

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB