Global Patent Index - EP 1015187 A1

EP 1015187 A1 2000-07-05 - PROCESS FOR TIGHTENING SCREW JOINTS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR TIGHTENING SCREW JOINTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SPANNEN VON SCHRAUBVERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SERRAGE DE JOINTS A VIS

Publication

EP 1015187 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917932 A

Priority

  • SE 9800727 W
  • SE 9701499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847665A1] A method for tightening screw joints up to a predetermined target torque level (TF) by a power tool which has a torque delivering output shaft and which is connected to a power control unit by which the rotation speed (v) of the output shaft is adjustable, wherein each tightening process comprises a primary phase (I) performed at one or more substantially constant speed levels and a final phase (II) performed at a variable rotation speed (v) having an average which is typically lower than the average of the primary tightening phase (I) speed levels and which has a lowest final level (v2) at the target torque level (TF). The rotation speed (v) during the final tightening phase (II) is varied in accordance with any suitable strategy for obtaining a short as possible cycle time without risking overtightening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/14; B23P 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 19/06 (2006.01); B25B 23/14 (2006.01); B25B 23/147 (2006.01); B25B 23/151 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23P 19/066 (2013.01); B25B 23/14 (2013.01); B25B 23/147 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847665A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847665 A1 19981029; DE 69807090 D1 20020912; DE 69807090 T2 20030508; EP 1015187 A1 20000705; EP 1015187 B1 20020807; JP 2001521448 A 20011106; JP 5054862 B2 20121024; SE 508963 C2 19981123; SE 9701499 D0 19970422; SE 9701499 L 19981023

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69807090

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE OLBRICHT, BUCHHOLD, KEULERTZ PA, DE

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807090 20020912

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991029

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT