Global Patent Index - EP 1015245 A1

EP 1015245 A1 2000-07-05 - DRIVING MECHANISM FOR A CYLINDER OF A ROTARY PRINTING MACHINE

Title (en)

DRIVING MECHANISM FOR A CYLINDER OF A ROTARY PRINTING MACHINE

Title (de)

ANTRIEB FÜR EINEN ZYLINDER EINER ROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR CYLINDRE DE ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 1015245 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934793 A

Priority

  • DE 9801432 W
  • DE 19722379 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853995A1] The invention relates to a driving mechanism for a cylinder of a rotary printing machine. According to the invention, the rotary axis (23) of a driving pinion (18) lies approximately on a straight line (22) defined by a rotary axis (08) of the cylinder and a swivelling axis (09) of an eccentric bush (04).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/012; B41F 13/28; B41F 13/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01); B41F 13/28 (2006.01); B41F 13/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/28 (2013.01); B41F 13/008 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853995A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853995 A1 19981203; WO 9853995 B1 19990401; BR 9809693 A 20000711; CN 1103285 C 20030319; CN 1258249 A 20000628; EP 1015245 A1 20000705; EP 1015245 B1 20020410; EP 1155828 A1 20011121; EP 1155828 B1 20030102; EP 1157831 A1 20011128; EP 1157831 B1 20030108; HK 1026870 A1 20030718; JP 2000512938 A 20001003; JP 3270065 B2 20020402; RU 2161561 C1 20010110; RU 99128059 A 20040320; US 6202555 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59803764

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140526

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130605

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120527

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120526

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803764 20020516

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020412

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE