Global Patent Index - EP 1015254 A1

EP 1015254 A1 2000-07-05 - FIDUCIARY DOCUMENT COATED WITH SECURITY PRINTS

Title (en)

FIDUCIARY DOCUMENT COATED WITH SECURITY PRINTS

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSDOKUMENT MIT SICHERHEITSDRUCK

Title (fr)

DOCUMENT FIDUCIAIRE REVETU D'IMPRESSIONS DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1015254 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98922896 A

Priority

  • FR 9800862 W
  • FR 9705597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762545A1] The invention concerns a fiduciary document or the like (1), such as a banknote, passport, identity card, bank card, comprising a medium (2) whereon are provided security prints (3, 4). The invention is characterised in that the security prints include: a first print (3) produced in ink of a first colour (C1) invisible to the naked eye but fluorescent or phosphorescent; a second print (4) covering the first and produced in ink of a second colour (C2) visible or invisible to the naked eye but fluorescent or phosphorescent, the second print (4) being produced so as to blur the first print, such that in neutral light or ultraviolet illumination, only said second print (4) is visible, while the first print (3) is revealed only in ultraviolet illumination and through a filter of the same colour (C1) as that of the first print (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/00 (2006.01); B44F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/29 (2014.10); B42D 25/387 (2014.10)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849016A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762545 A1 19981030; FR 2762545 B1 19990716; DE 69804113 D1 20020411; DE 69804113 T2 20021128; EP 1015254 A1 20000705; EP 1015254 B1 20020306; ES 2172891 T3 20021001; WO 9849016 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160506

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOIS-CHARLES OBERTHUR FIDUCIAIRE, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69804113

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69804113

- Representative's name: GILLE HRABAL, DE

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-03-14 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES

- Effective date: 20120302

2011-12-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111201 AND 20111207

2011-12-21 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111214

2011-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE SA

2011-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOIS-CHARLES OBERTHUR FIDUCIAIRE

- Free text: FRANCOIS-CHARLES OBERTHUR FIDUCIAIRE#102, BOULEVARD MALESHERBES#75017 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- FRANCOIS-CHARLES OBERTHUR FIDUCIAIRE#50 QUAI MICHELET#92300 LEVALLOIS PERRET (FR)

2011-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES

- Free text: FRANCOIS-CHARLES OBERTHUR FIDUCIAIRE#50 QUAI MICHELET#92300 LEVALLOIS PERRET (FR) -TRANSFER TO- OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES#50 QUAI MICHELET#92300 LEVALLOIS PERRET (FR)

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172891 T3

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804113 20020411

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB LI NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB LI NL