Global Patent Index - EP 1015317 A1

EP 1015317 A1 2000-07-05 - CARTON LOADING MECHANISM

Title (en)

CARTON LOADING MECHANISM

Title (de)

SCHACHTELBELADEMECHANISMUS

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE CHARGEMENT DE CARTONS

Publication

EP 1015317 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98947172 A

Priority

  • GB 9719950 A
  • US 9819619 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914123A1] An apparatus and method for continuously loading different types of cartons with articles delivered to the apparatus from an infeed stream of a packaging machine. The apparatus (50) comprises conveying means sequentially to deliver successive cartons (10) from a supply and to load said carton by lowering said carton onto at least one article. The conveying means comprises a plurality of carton engaging means (64) mounted to respective ones of a pair of endless chains (52, 54), wherein the carton is held between synchronised carton engaging means to maintain the carton in a set up condition as it is moved downstream. Adjustment means is provided to adjust one of said pair of endless chains relative to the other said endless chain to receive a different carton type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 21/24; B65B 43/26; B65B 59/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/26 (2006.01); B65B 21/24 (2006.01); B65B 59/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 59/02 (2013.01); B65B 21/242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914123A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914123 A1 19990325; AT 219439 T 20020715; AU 748924 B2 20020613; AU 9401298 A 19990405; CA 2303914 A1 19990325; CA 2303914 C 20060124; CN 1103715 C 20030326; CN 1278771 A 20010103; DE 69806169 D1 20020725; DE 69806169 T2 20030116; DK 1015317 T3 20020923; EP 1015317 A1 20000705; EP 1015317 B1 20020619; ES 2178846 T3 20030101; GB 9719950 D0 19971119; HK 1029777 A1 20021115; HU 0100209 A2 20010528; HU 0100209 A3 20010828; HU 224047 B1 20050530; IL 135144 D0 20010520; JP 2001516679 A 20011002; PL 188620 B1 20050331; PL 339411 A1 20001218; PT 1015317 E 20021031; ZA 9808596 B 19990323

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070921

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070922

2008-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070922

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLCONE HIGH RIDGE

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-06-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-04-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070321

2007-03-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070321

2006-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-09-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-01 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060901

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-05 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20051205

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-25 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

2005-10-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-21 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-05 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050905

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2005-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

2005-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC

- Free text: THE MEAD CORPORATION#COURTHOUSE PLAZA#NORTHEAST DAYTON, OH 45463 (US) -TRANSFER TO- MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC#ONE HIGH RIDGE PARK#STAMFORD, CT 06905 (US)

2004-12-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178846 T3

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403095

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-09-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806169 20020725

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219439 T 20020715

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE