Global patent index - EP 1015341 A1

EP 1015341 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD FOR FILLING A DISPENSER AND CORRESPONDING DISPENSER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FILLING A DISPENSER AND CORRESPONDING DISPENSER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BEFÜLLEN EINES SPENDERS UND SPENDER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REMPLIR UN DISTRIBUTEUR ET DISTRIBUTEUR CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1015341 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952620 A

Priority

  • DE 19741957 A
  • EP 9806025 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19741957A1] During the manufacturing packing process, an especially pharmaceutical fluid or paste is accurately dosed into a container (12) which is then closed. After the container has been filled, a closure is placed on the container and pushed down by a predefined distance to its end position, displacing any air, and raising the level of fluid or past in the discharge outlet to the full mark.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/34; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3047 (2013.01); B05B 11/0048 (2013.01); B05B 11/0097 (2013.01); B05B 11/3061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915424A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19741957 A1 19990325; EP 1015341 A1 20000705; EP 1015341 B1 20040121; US 6240979 B1 20010605; WO 9915424 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810639

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RPC WIKO GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT