Global Patent Index - EP 1015346 A1

EP 1015346 A1 2000-07-05 - PANEL INTERLOCKING MEANS FOR CARTONS

Title (en)

PANEL INTERLOCKING MEANS FOR CARTONS

Title (de)

WANDVERRIEGELUNG AN KARTONS

Title (fr)

ORGANE D'EMBOITEMENT DE PANNEAUX POUR BOITES EN CARTON

Publication

EP 1015346 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98907677 A

Priority

  • GB 9704235 A
  • US 9803916 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9838108A1] Panel interlocking means for securing together a first and a second panel (10, 12) in overlapping relationship, said first panel comprising a locking tab (14) struck from said first panel, the locking tab having a neck portion (20) hinged at a base thereof to said first panel and a shoulder portion (22) contiguous therewith, said second panel including a retaining tab (30) defining a locking aperture struck from said second panel and wherein the retaining tab is displaced out of the plane of said second panel to receive said locking tab through the locking aperture and abuts a portion of said locking tab projecting beyond said shoulder portion and wherein a locking edge (25) of the locking tab is provided at each of the opposed side edges of the locking tab at the shoulder portions to interengage with panel portions of said second panel located adjacent complementary curved edges (43, 45) of said locking aperture to maintain said first panel and said second panel in a locked overlapped relationship.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/24 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/12 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9838108A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9838108 A1 19980903; AR 011694 A1 20000830; AT 219447 T 20020715; AU 6342898 A 19980918; BR 9807634 A 20000222; CA 2282284 A1 19980903; CA 2282284 C 20050726; CN 1091733 C 20021002; CN 1253533 A 20000517; CO 4761090 A1 19990427; CZ 298999 B6 20080402; CZ 9903039 A3 20010613; DE 69806170 D1 20020725; DE 69806170 T2 20030102; DK 1015346 T3 20020715; EE 04104 B1 20030815; EE 9900370 A 20000417; EP 1015346 A1 20000705; EP 1015346 B1 20020619; ES 2179462 T3 20030116; GB 9704235 D0 19970416; HK 1029562 A1 20021115; HU 0001392 A2 20000828; HU 0001392 A3 20000928; HU 222670 B1 20030929; ID 23927 A 20000525; IL 131559 A 20030529; IL 131559 D0 20010128; JP 2001513735 A 20010904; JP 3989968 B2 20071010; MA 25583 A1 20021231; MY 118147 A 20040930; NO 314623 B1 20030422; NO 994163 A 19990827; NO 994163 D0 19990827; PL 186941 B1 20040430; PL 335384 A1 20000425; PT 1015346 E 20021129; RO 119077 B1 20040330; RS 49567 B 20070410; RU 2194658 C2 20021220; SK 117699 A3 20000612; SK 283770 B6 20040108; TR 9902221 T2 19991221; YU 7898 A 19990927; ZA 9801620 B 19980831

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020402904

- Effective date: 20160905

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160905

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160203

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-09-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69806170

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090227

2009-11-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090227

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-09-03 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090827

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLCONE HIGH RIDGE

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2005-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

2005-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC

- Free text: THE MEAD CORPORATION#COURTHOUSE PLAZA NE#DAYTON OHIO 45463 (US) -TRANSFER TO- MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC#ONE HIGH RIDGE PARK#STAMFORD, CT 06905 (US)

2004-12-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179462 T3

2002-12-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-11-01 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020402904

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806170 20020725

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-07-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219447 T 20020715

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990929

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE