Global Patent Index - EP 1015353 A1

EP 1015353 A1 2000-07-05 - HINGE-LID BOX FOR CIGARETTES

Title (en)

HINGE-LID BOX FOR CIGARETTES

Title (de)

KLAPPSCHACHTEL FÜR ZIGARETTEN

Title (fr)

PAQUET PLIANT POUR CIGARETTES

Publication

EP 1015353 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951331 A

Priority

  • DE 19741481 A
  • EP 9805509 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19741481A1] The package is rectangular in shape and has side walls (14, 15, 17) with round or inclined edges (24, 25). The opposing side wall (15, 17, 20) is limited by corner edges (26, 27). The round edges or the inclined edges on the one hand and the corner edges on the other hand are diagonally opposite one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/10; B65D 5/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/18 (2006.01); B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/6691 (2013.01); B65D 85/1045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915436A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19741481 A1 19990325; AU 9740098 A 19990412; BR 9812253 A 20000718; CN 1144746 C 20040407; CN 1273557 A 20001115; EP 1015353 A1 20000705; EP 1015353 B1 20021106; EP 1015353 B2 20061129; ID 24471 A 20000720; JP 2001517588 A 20011009; PL 194617 B1 20070629; PL 339307 A1 20001204; US 6311834 B1 20011106; WO 9915436 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150301

2015-03-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150301

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130808

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-05-25 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2007-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2007-02-14 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2007-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-12-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-11-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: G.D SOCIETA PER AZIONI

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: TOPACK VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

2003-11-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: G.D SOCIETA PER AZIONI

2003-10-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: G.D SOCIETAE PER AZIONI

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-10-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: TOPACK VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-09-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: G.D SOCIETAE PER AZIONI

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806212

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-12

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010410

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000311

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL