Global Patent Index - EP 1015370 A1

EP 1015370 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD FOR INTERMEDIATE STORAGE OF THREADS AND DELIVERY DEVICES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INTERMEDIATE STORAGE OF THREADS AND DELIVERY DEVICES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ZWISCHENSPEICHERN VON FADEN UND LIEFERGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LE STOCKAGE INTERMEDIAIRE DE FIL, ET APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR

Publication

EP 1015370 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951407 A

Priority

  • EP 9805870 W
  • SE 9703369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914149A1] The invention relates to a method for intermediate storage of threads (Y) on a drum-like storage body (4) of a delivery device (F) in which the thread is placed on the storage body (4) by means of an electrical winding drive mechanism (3) with relative rotational movements between a winding element (2) and a storage body interrupted by stationary periods (C). During each stationary period (C), one holding torque (H) operating in the winding direction is electrically generated in the electrical winding drive mechanism (3). An electromotor device (D) for blocking reverse rotation is provided in a delivery device for carrying out said method. Said electromotor device (D) can be activated by a holding current during each stationary period (C).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/361 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914149A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914149 A1 19990325; DE 59804821 D1 20020822; EP 1015370 A1 20000705; EP 1015370 B1 20020717; JP 2001516691 A 20011002; KR 100375717 B1 20030315; SE 9703369 D0 19970916; US 6279619 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040903

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-01 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040901

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-10-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804821 20020822

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL SE

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010810

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL SE