Global Patent Index - EP 1015407 A4

EP 1015407 A4 2000-11-08 - METHOD OF MAKING HYDROGENATED ACIDS

Title (en)

METHOD OF MAKING HYDROGENATED ACIDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HYDRIERTER SÄUREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ACIDES HYDROGENES

Publication

EP 1015407 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98948068 A

Priority

  • US 9817989 W
  • US 92581197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912882A1] A mixture of saturated and unsaturated carboxylic acids are hydrogenated with an effective amount of a hydrogenation catalyst and in the presence of an effective amount of an adsorbent to produce a hydrogenated product having less than about 200 ppm of oxygenated by-products.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 51/36; C07C 51/47; C07C 53/126

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 51/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 51/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912882 A1 19990318; AU 9471898 A 19990329; CA 2302609 A1 19990318; EP 1015407 A1 20000705; EP 1015407 A4 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030111

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011112

2000-11-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07C 51/36 A, 7C 07C 51/47 B, 7C 07C 53/126 B

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL