Global Patent Index - EP 1015500 A1

EP 1015500 A1 2000-07-05 - CATALYST COMPONENTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS AND CATALYST OBTAINED THEREFROM

Title (en)

CATALYST COMPONENTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS AND CATALYST OBTAINED THEREFROM

Title (de)

KATALYSATORBESTANDTEILE FÜR DIE OLEFINPOLYMERISATION UND DAMIT ERHALTENER KATALYSATOR

Title (fr)

COMPOSANTS CATALYSEURS POUR LA POLYMERISATION D'OLEFINES ET CATALYSEUR AINSI OBTENU

Publication

EP 1015500 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931136 A

Priority

  • EP 99931136 A
  • EP 9904318 W
  • EP 98202162 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000517A1] The present invention provides a catalyst component comprising a vanadium compound supported on a porous polymer having a porosity (mercury) higher than 0.02 cc/g. With the above catalyst components it is possible to prepare elastomeric copolymers of ethylene with alpha -olefins CH>2<=CHR, optionally containing minor proportions of a diene, without fouling problems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 4/02; B01J 23/22; B01J 31/06; B01J 35/10; C08F 4/68; C08F 10/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/22 (2006.01); B01J 31/06 (2006.01); B01J 31/22 (2006.01); B01J 31/26 (2006.01); B01J 35/10 (2006.01); C08F 4/02 (2006.01); C08F 4/6392 (2006.01); C08F 4/68 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01); C08F 10/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 31/26 (2013.01); B01J 31/0231 (2013.01); B01J 31/06 (2013.01); B01J 31/143 (2013.01); B01J 31/2234 (2013.01); C08F 10/00 (2013.01); B01J 2531/56 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/027
  2. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/68

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000517A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0000517 A1 20000106; CA 2301618 A1 20000106; CN 1275133 A 20001129; EP 1015500 A1 20000705; JP 2002519447 A 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLIOLEFINE ITALIA S.P.A.

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY B.V.

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL