Global patent index - EP 1015529 A1

EP 1015529 A1 2000-07-05 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR OBTAINING SIGNIFICANT OLEFIN YIELDS FROM RESIDUA FEEDSTOCKS

Title (en)

IMPROVED PROCESS FOR OBTAINING SIGNIFICANT OLEFIN YIELDS FROM RESIDUA FEEDSTOCKS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG HOHER OLEFINMENGEN AUS EINGESPEISTEN RÜCKSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE AMELIORE D'OBTENTION DE RENDEMENTS IMPORTANTS D'OLEFINE A PARTIR DE CHARGES D'ALIMENTATION RESIDUELLES

Publication

EP 1015529 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97931426 A

Priority

US 9711108 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9859018A1] Substantial amounts of olefinic products from residual feedstocks are obtained by contacting the feedstocks with fluidized hot solids in a short vapor contact time thermal process unit (1). The short vapor contact time thermal process unit (1) is comprised of a horizontal moving bed of fluidized hot particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 9/28; C10G 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 9/28 (2006.01); C10G 1/02 (2006.01); C10G 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 1/02 (2013.01); C10G 2400/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9859018 A1 19981230; AU 3505797 A 19990104; CA 2291189 A1 19981230; EP 1015529 A1 20000705; EP 1015529 A4 20020814; JP 2002505704 A 20020219

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-08-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SERRAND, WILLIBALD

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JACOBSON, MITCHELL

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LADWIG, PAUL, K.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PAGEL, JOHN, F.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PARRISH, MICHAEL, R.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SEIMANDI, NOEL

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WEISENBERGER, HANS, A.

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL