Global Patent Index - EP 1015623 A1

EP 1015623 A1 2000-07-05 - DRUG DISCOVERY USING MULTIPLE MEMBRANE MIMETIC AFFINITIES

Title (en)

DRUG DISCOVERY USING MULTIPLE MEMBRANE MIMETIC AFFINITIES

Title (de)

AUFFINDEN VON MEDIKAMENTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MEHRFACHEN MEMBRANEN MIT MIMETISCHEN AFFINITÄTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DECOUVERTE DE MEDICAMENTS FAISANT APPEL AUX AFFINITES MIMETIQUES DE MEMBRANES MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 1015623 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944484 A

Priority

  • US 9817398 W
  • US 5683397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910522A1] The measurement of multiple membrane affinities of test compounds, methods and compositions useful for acquiring data characteristic of such affinities, and a method and system for using such data alone or in combination with other molecular descriptors for the prediction of biological activity are described. The numerical values characteristic of biologically relevant interaction of test compounds with membrane mimetic surfaces are compared with corresponding values of one or more control compounds having a known biological activity. Probable biological activity of a test compound is identified with those control compounds whose multiple membrane interaction values most closely correlate to those of the test compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/00; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/566; G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); B01J 20/281 (2006.01); C12Q 1/00 (2006.01); G01N 30/88 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 30/02 (2006.01); G01N 30/89 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/54306 (2013.01); G01N 33/5432 (2013.01); G01N 33/54373 (2013.01); G01N 30/02 (2013.01); G01N 30/89 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G01N 30/02 + B01D 15/3852
  2. G01N 30/89 + G01N 30/463

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910522A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910522 A1 19990304; AU 736198 B2 20010726; AU 9201898 A 19990316; CA 2300863 A1 19990304; DE 1015623 T1 20020207; EP 1015623 A1 20000705; ES 2161203 T1 20011201; GR 20010300057 T1 20011031; IL 134458 D0 20010430; JP 2001514375 A 20010911; NO 20000838 A 20000330; NO 20000838 D0 20000221

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-09-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/00 A

2004-09-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 B

2004-09-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/566 B

2004-09-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 19/00 B

2002-02-07 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION

2001-12-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2161203 T1

2001-08-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000310;LT PAYMENT 20000310;LV PAYMENT 20000310;MK PAYMENT 20000310;RO PAYMENT 20000310;SI PAYMENT 20000310