Global Patent Index - EP 1015653 A1

EP 1015653 A1 2000-07-05 - METALLURGICAL VESSEL

Title (en)

METALLURGICAL VESSEL

Title (de)

METALLURGISCHES GEFÄSS

Title (fr)

CUVE METALLURGIQUE

Publication

EP 1015653 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98947371 A

Priority

  • DE 9802203 W
  • DE 19736720 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909232A1] A metallurgical vessel, in particular a converter for treating liquid, molten metals, in particular steel, has a refractory lining and a supporting metal shell that surrounds the refractory lining and is composed of dished parts and shell rings of creep-resistant steel welded together with up to 100 mm thickness. The metallurgical vessel is characterised in that a highly resistant, water quenched and then tempered, close-grained structural steel is used as creep-resistant steel. Said steel has the following composition, in percentages by weight: 0.14-0.22 C; 0.4-1.0 Cr; 0.3-0.8 Mo; 1.5-3.0 Ni; 0.05-0.12 V; 0.7-1.3 Mn; 0.015 Pmax; 0.003 Smax; 0.015-0.065 Al; 0.20-0.60 Si; 0.15 Cumax; 0.012 Nmax; 0.004 Camax; the remaining being iron and impurities due to the production process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/44; C21C 5/42; C21C 7/10; C21D 8/02; C22C 38/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/42 (2006.01); C21C 7/10 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C21D 8/0205 (2013.01); C22C 38/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909232A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909232 A1 19990225; AT 211778 T 20020115; AU 9431498 A 19990308; DE 19736720 C1 19990506; EP 1015653 A1 20000705; EP 1015653 B1 20020109; ES 2166618 T3 20020416; JP 2001515148 A 20010918; US 6368549 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050724

2004-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030725

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030724

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-07-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-07-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-07-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-07-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020627

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020619

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166618 T3

2002-04-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802854 20020228

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211778 T 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE