Global Patent Index - EP 1015665 A1

EP 1015665 A1 2000-07-05 - ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTROLYSEAPPARAT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR ELECTROLYSE

Publication

EP 1015665 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948931 A

Priority

  • DE 19740673 A
  • EP 9805698 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19740673A1] In one half of the casing (3,4) of each electrolytic cell (2), hydrophobic assemblies (12) are provided, confined by the partition (6). The hydrophobic assemblies are located where the primary bubbles form. They are sieve fabric, wire knit, nets or packings. The empty space is 60-98% of the cell volume. The open sieve area of the assemblies is 30-80%. Baffles are included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25B 15/08; C25B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 15/08 (2006.01); C25B 9/08 (2006.01); C25B 9/20 (2006.01); C25B 13/06 (2006.01); C25B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 15/00 (2013.01); C25B 9/08 (2013.01); C25B 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914402A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19740673 A1 19990318; DE 19740673 C2 20011031; AR 010945 A1 20000712; AU 9537798 A 19990405; EP 1015665 A1 20000705; EP 1015665 B1 20020213; JO 2044 B 19990515; JP 2001516811 A 20011002; JP 4346235 B2 20091021; MA 24648 A1 19990401; TN SN98172 A1 20000613; WO 9914402 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160909

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160909

2017-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160910

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803086

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-11-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803086 20020321

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BORUCINSKI, THOMAS

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GEGNER, JUERGEN

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DULLE, KARL-HEINZ

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOLLNY, MARTIN

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, CAROLA

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PRASSER, HORST-MICHAEL

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010723

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE