Global patent index - EP 1015675 A1

EP 1015675 A1 2000-07-05 - ROD-SHAPED THREAD-GUIDING ELEMENT FOR TEXTILES MACHINES, ESPECIALLY A HEALD, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

ROD-SHAPED THREAD-GUIDING ELEMENT FOR TEXTILES MACHINES, ESPECIALLY A HEALD, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

STABFÖRMIGES FADENFÜHRUNGSELEMENT FÜR TEXTILMASCHINEN, INSBESONDERE WEBLITZE, UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE GUIDAGE DE FIL EN BAGUETTE POUR MACHINES TEXTILES, NOTAMMENT LISSE PLATE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1015675 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941212 A

Priority

  • CH 9800396 W
  • CH 218497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914409A1] The invention relates to a rod-shaped thread-guiding element for textiles machines, especially a heald, comprising two longitudinal metal sections (22, 24) which open out into a middle section (16). The thread eye (10) is fixed in said middle section (16) by means of an adhesive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 9/028 (2013.01); D03C 9/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914409A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914409 A1 19990325; AT 203577 T 20010815; CH 692587 A5 20020815; CN 1094529 C 20021120; CN 1278876 A 20010103; DE 59801095 D1 20010830; EP 1015675 A1 20000705; EP 1015675 B1 20010725; ES 2158693 T3 20010901; JP 2001516814 A 20011002; JP 3546409 B2 20040728; RU 2197573 C2 20030127; US 6283163 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130917

2014-10-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20141007

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2008-05-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GROZ-BECKERT KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: GROZ-BECKERT K.G.PARKWEG 2, D-72458 ALBSTADT

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20071211

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: GROZ-BECKERT K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20071211

2002-07-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2158693

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2001-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801095

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-30

2001-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 203577

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI