Global Patent Index - EP 1015680 A1

EP 1015680 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SECURING THE END OF A STITCH BY DRAWING IN THE CHAIN OF THREAD IN SINGLE OR DUAL NEEDLE OVEREDGE STITCHING MACHINES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SECURING THE END OF A STITCH BY DRAWING IN THE CHAIN OF THREAD IN SINGLE OR DUAL NEEDLE OVEREDGE STITCHING MACHINES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR NAHTENDENSICHERUNG DURCH EINZIEHEN DER FADENKETTE AN EIN- UND ZWEINADEL-ÜBERWENDLICH-NÄHMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FINIR UNE COUTURE PAR UN POINT D'ARRET, PAR INTRODUCTION DE LA CHAINE DE FIL SUR DES MACHINES A COUDRE A SURJET A UNE OU DEUX AIGUILLES

Publication

EP 1015680 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97936647 A

Priority

  • DE 19719372 A
  • EP 9703938 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719372A1] The invention relates to a method and device for securing the end of a stitch by drawing in the chain of thread in single or dual needle overedge stitching machines. According to the invention, a thread guide (6) is pushed in between the lower side of the article which is to be sewn and the threads of the rapier. The thread chain (2) at the end of the stitch is then threaded through the eye (7) located at the end of the thread guide and the thread guide (6) is returned to its original position. This enables the chain of thread to be drawn in between the article (1) which is to be sewn and the cluster of rapier threads.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 65/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 65/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 65/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850618A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719372 A1 19981112; DE 19719372 C2 20011206; EP 1015680 A1 20000705; EP 1015680 B1 20011121; TW 373043 B 19991101; WO 9850618 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-09-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-05-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20011121

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59706081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB GR IT LI

2001-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB GR IT LI