Global Patent Index - EP 1015688 A1

EP 1015688 A1 2000-07-05 - IMPROVEMENTS IN EXTENDED NIP PRESS BELTS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN EXTENDED NIP PRESS BELTS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN BEIM PRESSBAND FÜR BREIT-NIP-PRESSEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES AUX COURROIES DE PRESSE AVEC ZONE DE PRESSION ETENDUE

Publication

EP 1015688 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942876 A

Priority

  • GB 9802735 W
  • GB 9719748 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914426A1] An extended nip press belt comprises a plurality of strips (14) each formed of a matrix of plastics (12) having perforations (13) to form a mesh or perforated membrane, and having reinforcing yarns (11) extending along the strips. The strips (14) are arranged in edge contact side by side across the width of the belt and their edges fused together along joints (15). The layer formed is embedded in a further matrix (16) containing further reinforcing yarns (17) at right angles to the yarns (11) and thus in the machine direction of the resulting belt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/00 (2006.01); D21F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0227 (2013.01); D21F 3/0236 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914426A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914426 A1 19990325; AT 217924 T 20020615; CA 2304072 A1 19990325; DE 69805532 D1 20020627; DE 69805532 T2 20030109; EP 1015688 A1 20000705; EP 1015688 B1 20020522; ES 2178251 T3 20021216; GB 9719748 D0 19971119; JP 2001516820 A 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040911

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040910

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040911

2004-09-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040911

2004-09-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-09-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-09-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2003-10-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030917

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030916

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030908

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030908

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178251 T3

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805532 20020627

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217924 T 20020615

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010423

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH FABRICS HEIDENHEIM GMBH & CO.KG

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB NL SE