Global Patent Index - EP 1015696 A1

EP 1015696 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A LIQUID-PERMEABLE SUCTION MOULD FOR USE IN MAKING ARTICLES OF PULP, AND MOULD MADE BY CARRYING OUT THE METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A LIQUID-PERMEABLE SUCTION MOULD FOR USE IN MAKING ARTICLES OF PULP, AND MOULD MADE BY CARRYING OUT THE METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLUSSIGKEITSDURCHLÄSSIGEN SAUGFORM FÜR FORMKÖRPER AUS FASERSTOFF UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE FORM.

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MOULE A ASPIRATION PERMEABLE AUX LIQUIDES UTILISABLE A LA PRODUCTION D'ARTICLES EN PATE ET MOULE OBTENU GRACE A CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1015696 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98901331 A

Priority

  • EP 98901331 A
  • DK 9800050 W
  • EP 97101959 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857822A1] In a suction mould (1) comprising a mould-surface structure (4) having openings (4'') allowing passage of the liquid but not of the fibres, in the form of closely spaced through-going ducts supported against the force of the suction by a backing structure (5), and adapted to be connected to a source (not shown) of sub-atmospheric pressure, for making a thin-walled article (not shown) by aspirating said slurry against the surface of the mould, the novel feature is that the mould-surface structure (4) and the backing structure (5) are integral parts of a common coherent body. With this arrangement, no separate backing structure is needed, making it possible, preferably by using novel methods of selective hardening of plastic materials, to manufacture moulds quickly and at low cost, making it more economical than previously to adapt the slurry-casting machine (not shown), in which the mould (1) is used, to the quickly changing requirements of the market. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21J 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21J 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21J 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835097A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0857822 A1 19980812; AU 5749898 A 19980826; DE 69808321 D1 20021031; DE 69808321 T2 20030522; EP 1015696 A1 20000705; EP 1015696 B1 20020925; WO 9835097 A1 19980813

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080209

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080209

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-12-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808321 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990907

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE